This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 14:48:46 (UTC).

NOYES, GRACE LAVENE - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 NOYES, GRACE LAVENE - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9904

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

NOYES PETER

NOYES JOHN PHILIP

Not Classified By Court and Conservators

NOYES GRACE LAVENE

NOYES JACK JOHN PHILLIP

NOYES JACK PHILIP

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

PROBATE INVESTIGATORS

ACEVEDO CHRISTINA

Interested Party

NOYES DAVID P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorneys

POLLOCK ADAM WAYNE

SHAPIRO LEONA

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

DUSHKES LARRY S.

DUSHKES LARRY S

 

Court Documents

Petition - Authority

11/15/2021: Petition - Authority

Post-Move Notice of Change of Residence

11/22/2021: Post-Move Notice of Change of Residence

Notice - Hearing

12/6/2021: Notice - Hearing

Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

10/25/2021: Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

10/25/2021: Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

10/25/2021: Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

10/25/2021: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

11/8/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

Minute Order

10/8/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object

10/7/2021: Notice - Filing Inventory/Appraisal & How to Object

Supplement - declaration of John Phillip Noyes and Status report of successor

9/28/2021: Supplement - declaration of John Phillip Noyes and Status report of successor

Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

10/1/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Inventory and Appraisal

Bond - Surety Rider

8/25/2021: Bond - Surety Rider

Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care

8/23/2021: Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care

Bond

8/18/2021: Bond

Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

8/18/2021: Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

Order - Appointing Conservator

8/9/2021: Order - Appointing Conservator

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

8/16/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketPost-Move Notice of Change of Residence; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Inventory and Appraisal )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof - Mailing (Proof - Mailing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof - Mailing (Proof - Mailing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof - Mailing (Proof - Mailing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook (Duties of Conservator ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel; Filed by Appointed Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketPetition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBATE INVESTIGATORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO LEONA