This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 05:42:03 (UTC).

NOUSHIN AHMADPOUR VS COSTCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 NOUSHIN AHMADPOUR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7908

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AHMADPOUR NOUSHIN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

COSTCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARCUS GERALD L. ESQ.

MARCUS GERALD LEE

Defendant Attorney

MURCHISON & CUMMING LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Settlement

10/2/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/22/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/22/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

6/5/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

6/9/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND ALL RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION 'TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC AND RELATED DATES;

3/24/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION 'TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FSC AND RELATED DATES;

Notice of Ruling

1/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/23/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/14/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

5/25/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLANT FOR DAMAGES

5/25/2018: COMPLANT FOR DAMAGES

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • Hearing11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docketat 11:52 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 10/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Noushin Ahmadpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 1:56 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Costco (Defendant); Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Noushin Ahmadpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Noushin Ahmadpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Noushin Ahmadpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLANT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC707908    Hearing Date: October 08, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

noushin ahmadpour,

Plaintiff,

v.

costco, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC707908

Hearing Date: October 8, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Gerald L. Marcus (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Noushin Ahmadpourt (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed Forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on Form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship and a conflict of interest between Counsel and Plaintiff. This constitutes good cause.

The Court vacates the final status conference, currently set for November 18, 2020, and the trial date, currently set for December 3, 2020. The Court sets a trial setting conference for November 25, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Any party who does not appear shall waive the right to be heard and shall submit to any trial dates selected by the Court.

The Court orders Counsel to serve this order, as well as a signed copy of Form MC-053, upon all parties, including his client, within ten (10) days. Counsel will remain attorney of record until he files with the Court proof of service in compliance with this order.

DATED: October 8, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court