This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 21:31:46 (UTC).

NOURREDINE ABES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LOCKHEAD MARTIN CORPORATION, A MARYLAND CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 NOURREDINE ABES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOCKHEAD MARTIN CORPORATION, A MARYLAND CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2179

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABES AN INDIVIDUAL NOURREDINE

Defendants

AVIS BUDGET GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LOCKHEAD MARTIN CORPORATION A MARYLAND CORPORATION

MCCREARY AN INDIVIDUAL CATHERINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L.

Defendant Attorney

KUCK DANIELLE L.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/29/2021: PI General Order

Answer

10/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2024
  • Hearing08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Erroneously Sued As LOCKHEAD MARTIN CORPORATION, a Maryland corporation (Defendant); AVIS BUDGET GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NOURREDINE ABES, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by NOURREDINE ABES, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NOURREDINE ABES, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NOURREDINE ABES, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NOURREDINE ABES, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lockheed Martin Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AVIS / BUDGET GROUP INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUCK DANIELLE L