This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 10:34:17 (UTC).

NOURAN DOUMANIAN, ET AL. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 NOURAN DOUMANIAN, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2393

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOUMANIAN NOURAN

SARKISYAN RAFI ERVANT

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A CORPORATION

SANTA MONICA FORD LINCOLN A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nouran Doumanian (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/19/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Nouran Doumanian (Plaintiff); As to: Santa Monica Ford Lincoln, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/23/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Nouran Doumanian (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/19/2022; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nouran Doumanian (Plaintiff); Rafi Ervant Sarkisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a corporation (Defendant); Santa Monica Ford Lincoln, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nouran Doumanian (Plaintiff); Rafi Ervant Sarkisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a corporation (Defendant); Santa Monica Ford Lincoln, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nouran Doumanian (Plaintiff); Rafi Ervant Sarkisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company, a corporation (Defendant); Santa Monica Ford Lincoln, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR NORMAN F.