This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 03:31:29 (UTC).

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0890

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHN JONATHAN E.

Defendant Attorney

KIM JENNIFER M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE COMPLAINT

9/16/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 05/26/2022

5/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 05/26/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/26/2022

5/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/26/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/26/2022]

5/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/26/2022]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

Notice of Settlement

5/23/2022: Notice of Settlement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

8/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Statement

7/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

7/1/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/1/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

General Denial

7/10/2020: General Denial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/9/2020: PI General Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP on 06/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to the Complaint; Filed by: NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department F - Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/26/2022]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 05/26/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP (Plaintiff); As to: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less