This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2019 at 17:25:54 (UTC).

NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES INC VS BEVERLY D SIMS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BEVERLY D SIMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2743

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES INC.

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

SIMS BEVERLY D.

CALFHA MORTGAGE ASSISTANCE CORPORATION

MACKLIN JENENNE R.

MACKLIN BEVERLY D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

HANAWALT JAMIE DIANE

Defendant Attorneys

GUTTMAN J BRUCE

KASAI WAYNE TAKASHI

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

ANSWER OF BEVERLY D. SIMS TO COMPLAINT OF NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC. FOR INTERPLEADER

7/31/2018: ANSWER OF BEVERLY D. SIMS TO COMPLAINT OF NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC. FOR INTERPLEADER

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

7/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/3/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

8/3/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

11/21/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/27/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

12/27/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

12/27/2018: Declaration

Motion for Leave to Amend

12/27/2018: Motion for Leave to Amend

Joinder

1/23/2019: Joinder

Reply

1/25/2019: Reply

Opposition

1/28/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

2/1/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

2/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Order

2/11/2019: Order

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (- *SOD FINAL?*) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketObjection (TO JENNENE R. MACKLIN'S RESPONSE TO BEVERLY SIMS' OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION); Filed by Beverly D. Sims (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketResponse (to Objection to Proposed Statement of Decision); Filed by Jenenne R. Macklin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (- *SOD FINAL?*) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketObjection (TO PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION); Filed by Beverly D. Sims (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (- SOD out?) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Beverly D. Sims (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Jenenne R. Macklin (Defendant); Beverly D. Sims (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDISCLAIMER OF INTEREST FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketDisclaimer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketDISCLAIMER OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT OF NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC. FOR INTERPLEADER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Northwest Trustee Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less