This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:19:16 (UTC).

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC VS RIGOBERTO ME

Case Summary

On 02/08/2017 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIGOBERTO ME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0033

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

MELENDEZ RIGOBERTO

RIGO'S PAINTING AND CLEANING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CRIBB STEVEN D. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CARLO O REYES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/2/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/26/2017: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/19/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/11/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/6/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/5/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/28/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/28/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

2/8/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT/OPEN BOOK MONIES DUE

2/8/2017: COMPLAINT/OPEN BOOK MONIES DUE

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

1/8/2018: Minute Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Northern California Collection Service (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 40; (Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT/OPEN BOOK MONIES DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Northern California Collection Service (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0033    Hearing Date: September 02, 2020    Dept: 40

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Northern California Collection Service, Inc.,

OPPOSITION: None

On February 8, 2017, Plaintiff Northern California Collection Service, Inc., sued Defendant Rigoberto Melendez dba Rigo’s Painting and Cleaning. The only cause of action alleged was an open book account. Defendant had an open book account with the State Compensation Fund for insurance premiums. The State Compensation Fund assigned its rights to the debt to Plaintiff. In February 2018, Plaintiff and Defendant entered into a settlement agreement in which they agreed to settle the matter for $54,000. Defendant made two payments totaling $12,000 but has failed to pay the remainder. Plaintiff requests that judgment be entered in the amount of $65,813.22, as per the agreement.

The agreement between the parties states that:

“If the default is not timely cured, then Plaintiff shall, by ex parte application without further hearing or notice to Defendant, be entitled to have a Judgment entered in the amount stated in the prayer of the Complaint, including $548.00 in court costs, minus credit for payments made by Defendant under this agreement.” (Mtn, Ex. A, ¶4.) Plaintiff requests the following judgment:

$23,376.60 ($52,693.62 at 10% from 11/12/2015-4/20/2020)

- $12.000.00 Payments deducted from interest

=$ 11,376.60 Interest remaining

+

$ 52,693.62 Principal (Prayer)

$ 543.00 Costs

$ 1,200.00 Attorneys’ fees (Permitted by Civil Code ; 1717.5)

=$65,813.22

The Court has reviewed the Complaint and has confirmed Plaintiff’s interest calculation.

Accordingly, Plaintiff’s motion to enforce settlement is GRANTED. Judgment will be entered in accordance with the terms of the agreement, totaling $65,813.22, against Defendant.