This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 01:44:56 (UTC).

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. VS LIFESTYLE EXECUTIVE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS SERENE AS SERENE CHAUFFERS, INC.,

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against LIFESTYLE EXECUTIVE GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS SERENE AS SERENE CHAUFFERS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4287

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC.

Defendant

LIFESTYLE EXECUTIVE GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS SERENE AS SERENE CHAUFFERS INC. DBA BEST CITY LIMOUSINE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRIBB STEVEN D.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/9/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC. is a litigant