This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 23:15:12 (UTC).

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. VS A.W.E. GLOBAL SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A W E GLOBAL SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC.

Defendants

A.W.E. GLOBAL SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ACCESS WORLDWIDE EXPRESS DBA ADCOM WORLDWIDE EXPRESS

ALL WHEELS EXPRESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ALL WHEELS EXPRESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRIBB STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC. is a litigant