This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2019 at 18:57:03 (UTC).

NORTHERN CA. COLLECTION... VS ALL AMERICAN DESIGN...; ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 NORTHERN CA COLLECTION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALL AMERICAN DESIGN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2195

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE...

Defendants

ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC.

DOES ONE THROUGH TEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN D. CRIBB

CRIBB STEVEN D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE... (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 11; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE... (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE... (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less