This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 16:58:00 (UTC).

NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND SERVICING AGENT FOR NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST FKA EFS CREDIT VS EVO REALTY & FINANCE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND SERVICING AGENT FOR NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST FKA EFS CREDIT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EVO REALTY FINANCE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1678

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND SERVICING AGENT FOR NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST FKA EFS CREDIT TRUST FKA EFS CREDIT TRUST

Defendants

EVO REALTY & FINANCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KANU FRANK EMMANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENDRICK ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summary of the Case

12/17/2021: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

12/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/17/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/20/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

10/20/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/20/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

10/20/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion - Other Application for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion - Other Application for Writ of Possession and Turn Over Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Writ of Possession); Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Writ of Possession); Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC, a limited liability company and servicing agent for NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST fka EFS CREDIT TRUST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH MILL EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND SERVICING AGENT FOR NORTH MILL CREDIT TRUST FKA EFS CREDIT TRUST FKA EFS CREDIT TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKENDRICK ROBERT