This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2022 at 10:26:10 (UTC).

NORTH AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION VS 1688 SUNSET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 NORTH AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1688 SUNSET LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9777

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NORTH AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

NORTH AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

1688 SUNSET LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GOUGH ROBERT

1688 SUNSET LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GODSIL JOHN P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING CALCULATION OF PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST

2/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING CALCULATION OF PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST

Statement of the Case

2/15/2022: Statement of the Case

Request for Judicial Notice

2/15/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION ECLARATION OF JOHN P. GODSIL IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION ECLARATION OF JOHN P. GODSIL IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF S. DAVID SCHREIBER IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF S. DAVID SCHREIBER IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 13-22 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 13-22 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 1 - 5 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 1 - 5 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 6 - 10 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 6 - 10 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 12 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 12 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP PACKAGE)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP PACKAGE)

Default Judgment

2/24/2022: Default Judgment

Default Judgment

2/24/2022: Default Judgment

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Submittal of Default Prove-Up Package) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Submittal of Default Prove-Up Package) of 02/24/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submittal of Default Prove-Up Package)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice (AMENDED PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 12 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 13-22 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 6 - 10 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 1 - 5 IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF JOHN P. GODSIL IN SUPPORT OF: (1) APPLICATION TO SERVE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT BY PUBLICATION; AND (2) APPLICATION TO SERVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THROUGH CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE [CORPORATIONS CODE 17061]); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MAUREEN BAKER IN SUPPORT OF: (1) APPLICATION TO SERVE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT BY PUBLICATION; AND (2) APPLICATION TO SERVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY THROUGH CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE [CORPORATIONS CODE 17061]); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint (For Express Indemnity); Filed by North American Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GODSIL JOHN P.