This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 12:33:17 (UTC).

NORMAN S. WRIGHT, ET AL. VS ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 NORMAN S WRIGHT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2680

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WRIGHT NORMAN S.

NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT LLC

Defendants

BEHFARIN FRED

ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ABCO TRADING CO A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

ABCO TRADING CO

ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BLUM HOWARD SCOTT

BLUM HOWARD S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION DBA ABCO T...)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION DBA ABCO T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION DBA ABCO T...) OF 09/25/2019

9/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION DBA ABCO T...) OF 09/25/2019

Notice of Settlement

9/24/2019: Notice of Settlement

Case Management Statement

9/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND DEPARTMENT FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE/ NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND DEPARTMENT FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE/ NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/11/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/11/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRED BEHFARIN

6/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRED BEHFARIN

Case Management Statement

6/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY

6/21/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/24/2019

6/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 06/24/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

6/24/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/23/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • Hearing08/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Elizabeth Allen White, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Defendants ABCO Development Corporation dba ABCO T...) of 09/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants ABCO Development Corporation dba ABCO T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment; Filed by Fred Behfarin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Fred Behfarin); Filed by ABCO Development Corporation (Defendant); Fred Behfarin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by ABCO Development Corporation (Defendant); Fred Behfarin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by ABCO Development Corporation (Defendant); Fred Behfarin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff); Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff); Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC (Plaintiff); Climatec Mechanical Equipment, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN S. WRIGHT CLIMATEC MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ABCO TRADING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ABCO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUM HOWARD S.