This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 11:13:04 (UTC).

NORMAN MERIDA VS NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 NORMAN MERIDA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0849

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIDA NORMAN

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

SALAS RODRIGO ENRIQUE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/22/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/24/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Norman Merida (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Norman Merida (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 03/22/2023; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Norman Merida (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Norman Merida (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Norman Merida (Plaintiff); As to: Nissan North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department G Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less