This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 00:54:07 (UTC).

NORMAN, FOX & CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 NORMAN, FOX CO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0145

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORMAN FOX & CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HOWELL DAVID J.

HOWELL MELODY A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MOORE JOEY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Norman, Fox & Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norman, Fox & Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norman, Fox & Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norman, Fox & Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Norman, Fox & Co., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMAN FOX & CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where INTEGRITY INGREDIENTS CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE JOEY