This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 11:19:49 (UTC).

NORMAN E. JONES FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 NORMAN E JONES FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6567

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

STILLWAGON COLE

STILLWAGON SHANE

Not Classified By Court

NORMAN E. JONES FAMILY TRUST

Trustee

JONES DARRELL C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

Not Classified By Court and Trustee Attorneys

BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/27/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/23/2022: Minute Order

Motion - Motion for Order to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action

9/9/2021: Motion - Motion for Order to Expunge Notice of Pendency of Action

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Supplement - 2nd Supplement to Report of Sale & Petition for Order

9/13/2021: Supplement - 2nd Supplement to Report of Sale & Petition for Order

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

9/16/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Opposition

10/12/2021: Opposition

Reply - Reply iso Motion for Order to Expunge Noitce of Pendency of Action

10/15/2021: Reply - Reply iso Motion for Order to Expunge Noitce of Pendency of Action

Minute Order

10/22/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Citation

11/9/2021: Proof of Service - Citation

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

11/9/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

11/12/2021: Proof - Mailing - Proof - Mailing

Objection - Objection to Petition for 1) Determination of beneficiaries, et al

11/15/2021: Objection - Objection to Petition for 1) Determination of beneficiaries, et al

Minute Order

11/19/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/19/2021: Minute Order

Objection - Trust Petition - Objections to Report of Sale

9/7/2021: Objection - Trust Petition - Objections to Report of Sale

Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale - Report of Sale of Real Property -Authority

7/27/2021: Petition - Report and Confirmation of Sale - Report of Sale of Real Property -Authority

Miscellaneous Document - Cover Sheet for Trust and amendments

7/27/2021: Miscellaneous Document - Cover Sheet for Trust and amendments

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketObjection - Trust Petition (Objections to Report of Sale ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSupplement (To Report of Sale ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPetition - Report and Confirmation of Sale (Report of Sale of Real Property -Authority ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Cover Sheet for Trust and amendments ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition - Trust (Initial) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCitation (Citation ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHN RICHARD ANTON