This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 21:33:37 (UTC).

NORMA SIMMONS VS HEATH BRYAN GOLDMAN

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 NORMA SIMMONS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HEATH BRYAN GOLDMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6810

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMMONS NORMA

Defendant

GOLDMAN HEATH BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHABY DAVID MICHAEL II

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2024
  • Hearing10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norma Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norma Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norma Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Norma Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norma Simmons (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHABY DAVID MICHAEL II