This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 20:35:15 (UTC).

NORMA RAMIREZ VS KFC CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 NORMA RAMIREZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KFC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2689

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ NORMA

Defendants

KFC CORPORATION

NSB ASSOCIATES INC.

SHERMAN PLAZA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HABBAS SAMER

Defendant Attorney

FREE LAURA A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/8/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/28/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2024
  • Hearing08/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Hearing03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NSB Associates Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by NSB Associates Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norma Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Norma Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Norma Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norma Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Norma Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norma Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFC CORPORATION is a litigant