This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:02:51 (UTC).

NORMA PATRICIA GONZALEZ VS CITY OF PARAMOUNT ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 NORMA PATRICIA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF PARAMOUNT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2849

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GONZALEZ NORMA PATRICIA

Respondents and Defendants

PARAMOUNT CITY OF

FIRST TRANSIT

DEOS 1 THROUGH 50

CASTILLO ZULLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DAVIDSON LAURA LYNN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

7/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

SUMMONS

7/5/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

7/23/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Request for Dismissal

4/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/29/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/29/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Laura Lynn Davidson, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norma Patricia Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIDSON LAURA LYNN ESQ