This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 09:13:02 (UTC).

NORMA ELIZABETH MCDUFFIE, AN INDIVIDAUL VS THE KROGER CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 NORMA ELIZABETH MCDUFFIE, AN INDIVIDAUL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2405

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDUFFIE AN INDIVIDAUL NORMA ELIZABETH

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAHOUDAI YOSI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2024
  • Hearing08/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NORMA ELIZABETH MCDUFFIE, an Individaul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NORMA ELIZABETH MCDUFFIE, an Individaul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NORMA ELIZABETH MCDUFFIE, an Individaul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAHOUDAI YOSI ESQ.