This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 20:28:03 (UTC).

NORMA CASTANEDA, ET AL. VS LEGACY PARTNERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 NORMA CASTANEDA, filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LEGACY PARTNERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1307

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASTANEDA NORMA

HEITZ ARISA

HORAN SHANE

LEWIS MICHAEL

SANTANELLO KYLIE

VASQUEZ EMILIO

Defendant

LEGACY PARTNERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY GLENN AARON

Defendant Attorney

TRUONG TIFFANY D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/20/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/20/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/20/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/20/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

2/8/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/22/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • Hearing07/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Norma Castaneda (Plaintiff); Shane Horan (Plaintiff); Kylie Santanello (Plaintiff); Michael Lewis (Plaintiff); Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff); Emilio Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Norma Castaneda (Plaintiff); Shane Horan (Plaintiff); Kylie Santanello (Plaintiff); Michael Lewis (Plaintiff); Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff); Emilio Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Norma Castaneda (Plaintiff); Shane Horan (Plaintiff); Kylie Santanello (Plaintiff); Michael Lewis (Plaintiff); Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff); Emilio Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/23/2023; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Legacy Partners, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAddress for Glenn Aaron Murphy (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Norma Castaneda (Plaintiff); Shane Horan (Plaintiff); Kylie Santanello (Plaintiff); Michael Lewis (Plaintiff); Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff); Emilio Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Norma Castaneda (Plaintiff); Shane Horan (Plaintiff); Kylie Santanello (Plaintiff); Michael Lewis (Plaintiff); Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff); Emilio Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Norma Castaneda (Plaintiff); Shane Horan (Plaintiff); Kylie Santanello (Plaintiff); Michael Lewis (Plaintiff); Arisa Heitz (Plaintiff); Emilio Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Legacy Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less