This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 00:49:30 (UTC).

NORBERTO GARCIA VS MIXTO HOLDINGS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 NORBERTO GARCIA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MIXTO HOLDINGS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8536

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA NORBERTO

Defendants

OASIS OUTSOURCING III INC.

MIXTO HOLDINGS INC. DBA MIXTO COMIDA LATINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA CHRISTOPHER L.

KAMARZARIAN EDWIN M.

YANG SEUNG L.

Defendant Attorney

BUAN KRISTINA NOEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

6/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021, STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES FILED ON 6/29/2021

6/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/29/2021, STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES FILED ON 6/29/2021

Case Management Statement

3/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/19/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/19/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Answer

1/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/8/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Hearing12/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/29/2021, Stipulation and Order Continuing Trial and Related Dates filed on 6/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Continuing Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Domination Collaboration, Inc. dba Mixto Comida Latina Erroneously Sued As Mixto Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); Oasis Outsourcing III, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 1:44 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/19/2021, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Norberto Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS OUTSOURCING III INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUAN KRISTINA NOEL