This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 00:01:03 (UTC).

NORA OCHOA, ET AL. VS VERNA K. TROMBLY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 NORA OCHOA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VERNA K TROMBLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7007

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OCHOA NORA

SOLIS JAIME

Defendants

TROMBLY VERNA K.

TROMBLY VINCENT L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OBAGI ZEIN E. JR.

OBAGI ZEIN E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nora Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Nora Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nora Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jaime Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nora Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jaime Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nora Ochoa (Plaintiff); Jaime Solis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBAGI ZEIN E