Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2021 at 05:56:27 (UTC).

NORA AMARAL, ET AL. VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 NORA AMARAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0630

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

URBANO STACY

AMARAL NORA

URBANO STEPHANIE

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/23/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/10/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

1/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

9/29/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

9/29/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GABRIEL

8/20/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR GABRIEL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

8/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/14/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALEXANDEF

8/14/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ALEXANDEF

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JULES

8/17/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JULES

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/13/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/13/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

8/13/2020: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jules); Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Alexander); Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Gabriel); Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nora Amaral (Plaintiff); Stephanie Urbano (Plaintiff); Stacy Urbano (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O