This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 03:09:52 (UTC).

NOPPASON KOKILAWATEE VS CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 NOPPASON KOKILAWATEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6707

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOKILAWATEE NOPPASON

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

TENYENHUIS DESMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER MICHAEL R.

Defendant Attorney

BROWN MARK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/5/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/8/2021: Answer

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2024
  • Hearing10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by California Highway Patrol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Noppason Kokilawatee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Noppason Kokilawatee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Noppason Kokilawatee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Noppason Kokilawatee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER MICHAEL R.