This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 14:40:05 (UTC).

NOORDHOF, MARY K. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 NOORDHOF, MARY K - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0811

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NOORDHOF NICO K.

Decedent

NOORDHOF MARY K.

Others

ARMSTRONG JAMES J ESQ

ROSS FRANCES I

Administrator

VAN WINGERDEN TIFFANY

Not Classified By Court

BITETT ALAN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LE LAMDIEN THANH

Other Attorneys

ARMSTRONG JAMES JOHN

ESQUIBIAS DAVID A.

ESQUIBIAS DAVID

Administrator Attorney

LESTER MARK ABBOTT

 

Court Documents

Bond - suretec

4/29/2022: Bond - suretec

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

5/3/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Letters (Initial)

5/3/2022: Letters (Initial)

Objection - OBJECTION TO ORDER

4/25/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO ORDER

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

4/27/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Motion - Reconsideration - MOTION (NOTICE OF) FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT RULING/MINUTE ORDER/ORDER DATED APRIL 15, 2022

4/27/2022: Motion - Reconsideration - MOTION (NOTICE OF) FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT RULING/MINUTE ORDER/ORDER DATED APRIL 15, 2022

Substitution of Attorney - NEW SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FORM BY OBJECTOR/PETITIONER, FRANCES I. ROSS (PETITIONER/TRUSTEE IN CONCURRENT & COLLATERAL VCSC CASE NO. 56-2021-00551924-PR-TR-OXN)

11/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney - NEW SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FORM BY OBJECTOR/PETITIONER, FRANCES I. ROSS (PETITIONER/TRUSTEE IN CONCURRENT & COLLATERAL VCSC CASE NO. 56-2021-00551924-PR-TR-OXN)

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Existing Letters of Special Administration to January 9, 2022; Consent of Tiffany Van Wingerden to Serve; Declaration of Joseph Meissn

12/6/2021: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Existing Letters of Special Administration to January 9, 2022; Consent of Tiffany Van Wingerden to Serve; Declaration of Joseph Meissn

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application

1/5/2022: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application

Notice - Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/9/2022: Notice - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application For Order Extending Existing Letters of Special Administration to August 31, 2022; Consent of Tiffany Van Wingerden to Serve; Declaration of Joseph Meissn

2/22/2022: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application For Order Extending Existing Letters of Special Administration to August 31, 2022; Consent of Tiffany Van Wingerden to Serve; Declaration of Joseph Meissn

Ex Parte Opposition - $60 - OPPOSITION & OBJECTION TO DROP-OFF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER NOORDHOF FILED & SERVED FEBRUARY 22, 2022, BY OBJECTORS FOR ORDER EXTENDING EXISTING LETTERS

2/23/2022: Ex Parte Opposition - $60 - OPPOSITION & OBJECTION TO DROP-OFF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER NOORDHOF FILED & SERVED FEBRUARY 22, 2022, BY OBJECTORS FOR ORDER EXTENDING EXISTING LETTERS

Supplement - to objection

2/23/2022: Supplement - to objection

Proof of Service

2/24/2022: Proof of Service

Ex Parte - Order - Denied without Prejudice

2/24/2022: Ex Parte - Order - Denied without Prejudice

Supplement - Supplement to Drop Off Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Existing Letters of Special Administration to August 31, 2022; Declaration by Justin Alvarez In Support of Supplement

2/24/2022: Supplement - Supplement to Drop Off Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Existing Letters of Special Administration to August 31, 2022; Declaration by Justin Alvarez In Support of Supplement

Petition - Letters Special Admin w/o Gen Powers (Subsequent)

3/10/2022: Petition - Letters Special Admin w/o Gen Powers (Subsequent)

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

3/10/2022: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2023
  • Hearing09/15/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketBond (suretec ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMotion - Reconsideration (MOTION (NOTICE OF) FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT RULING/MINUTE ORDER/ORDER DATED APRIL 15, 2022 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketObjection (OBJECTION TO ORDER )

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketObjection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate (Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedents Estate - $435.00 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSupplement (To Petition for Letters ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESTER MARK ABBOTT