This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 21:46:09 (UTC).

NONYA FINKELSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CLARENCE WEBB, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 NONYA FINKELSTEIN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLARENCE WEBB, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0158

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINKELSTEIN AN INDIVIDUAL NONYA

Defendants

RAISER LLC

RAISER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES

WEBB AN INDIVIDUAL CLARENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HESAM

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/10/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: NONYA FINKELSTEIN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CLARENCE WEBB, an individual (Defendant); UBER TECHNOLOGIES (Defendant); RAISER,LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: NONYA FINKELSTEIN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CLARENCE WEBB, an individual (Defendant); UBER TECHNOLOGIES (Defendant); RAISER,LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NONYA FINKELSTEIN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: CLARENCE WEBB, an individual (Defendant); UBER TECHNOLOGIES (Defendant); RAISER,LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less