This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:14:29 (UTC).

NONA WILLIAMSON ET AL VS LOYA CASUALTY INS CO

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 NONA WILLIAMSON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LOYA CASUALTY INS CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9893

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMSON CHARLES

WILLIAMSON NONA

Defendant

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVIN TODD E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PASCOE WILLIAM T. ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

1/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY

SUMMONS

1/11/2018: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/19/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/19/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

1/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.'S ANSWER TO NONA WILLIAMSON AND CHARLES WILLIAMSON'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/26/2018: LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE CO.'S ANSWER TO NONA WILLIAMSON AND CHARLES WILLIAMSON'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANT LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE CO'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

3/13/2018: DEFENDANT LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE CO'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

4/9/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/14/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nona Williamson (Plaintiff); Charles Williamson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 62; (OSC - No Return of Service; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Nona Williamson (Plaintiff); Charles Williamson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Nona Williamson (Plaintiff); Charles Williamson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nona Williamson (Plaintiff); Charles Williamson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less