This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 07:52:10 (UTC).

NOMAD.ME, INC., ET AL. VS MICHAEL CULHANE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 NOMAD ME, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL CULHANE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7975

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

REID NICHOLAS

COPLEY TODD

NOMAD.ME INC.

REID NICHOLAS MASAMI

NOMAD.ME INC. FKA TRIPX INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THIESS SVEN

TAU PARTNERS LLC

TRIPTEK INC.

CULHANE MICHAEL

GROVES RENEE CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

CAIRNS JACK THOMAS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PROUT SHANEN R.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Cross-Complaint

4/14/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/14/2021: Answer

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/2/2021: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer

6/2/2021: Answer

Answer

7/12/2021: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Hearing07/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TripTek, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Sven Thiess (Cross-Complainant); Michael Culhane (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Masami Reid (Cross-Defendant); Todd Copley (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by TripTek, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Sven Thiess (Cross-Complainant); Michael Culhane (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Culhane (Defendant); TAU Partners, LLC (Defendant); TripTek, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Culhane (Defendant); TAU Partners, LLC (Defendant); TripTek, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Michael Culhane (Defendant); TripTek, Inc. (Defendant); Sven Thiess (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nomad.Me, Inc. (Plaintiff); Todd Copley (Plaintiff); Nicholas Reid (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROUT SHANEN