This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2022 at 16:02:04 (UTC).

NOLON D. OROZCO VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 NOLON D OROZCO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0033

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OROZCO NOLON D.

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGEE WILLIAM R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/22/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- WILLIAM R. MCGEE (Attorney): Organization Name: LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM R. McGEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for WILLIAM R. MCGEE (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- DEANNA WALLACE-TRACY, (do not notice-same firm) (Attorney): Name Suffix: (do not notice-same firm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for DEANNA WALLACE-TRACY, (do not notice-same firm) (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Nolon D. Orozco (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Nolon D. Orozco (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Nolon D. Orozco (Plaintiff); As to: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGEE WILLIAM R