This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2018 at 10:38:11 (UTC).

NOIL USA INC VS HARVESTING KING TRADING USA

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 NOIL USA INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARVESTING KING TRADING USA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1081

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NOIL USA INC

Respondents and Defendants

HARVESTING KING TRADING USA

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GAREEB ALEXANDER S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/25/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

10/25/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/21/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOIL USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAREEB ALEXANDER S. ESQ.