This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2023 at 11:35:40 (UTC).

NOHA EID VS H2O TO GO/OPAL SPRINGS WATER, CO., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 NOHA EID filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against H2O TO GO/OPAL SPRINGS WATER, CO , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4301

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EID NOHA

Cross Defendants and Defendants

FOUNTAIN OF TRUTH SPRING WATER LLC

H2O TO GO/OPAL SPRINGS WATER CO. INC.

RANCHO COLD STORAGE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

RANCHO COLD STORAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENDRICKS CHRISTOPHER LEE

Defendant Attorneys

CONCHING STEPHEN

CONNOLLY KILEY MCCARTHY

DERBY PAUL B.

Cross Defendant Attorney

WOODS KIANNA NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/8/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

2/8/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/8/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/15/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

12/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

12/5/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

11/3/2022: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIANNA N. WOODS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

10/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIANNA N. WOODS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DEFENDANT H20 TO GO/OPAL SPRINGS WATER CO., INC.S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; AND APPLICAT

10/27/2022: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DEFENDANT H20 TO GO/OPAL SPRINGS WATER CO., INC.S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; AND APPLICAT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/12/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Response - RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

5/27/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

5/27/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

6/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAddress for Christopher Lee Hendricks (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAddress for Christopher Lee Hendricks (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Noha Eid on 04/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Noha Eid as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff); As to: H2O To Go/Opal Springs Water, Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff); As to: H2O To Go/Opal Springs Water, Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff); As to: Fountain of Truth Spring Water, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff); As to: H2O To Go/Opal Springs Water, Co., Inc. (Defendant); Fountain of Truth Spring Water, LLC (Defendant); Rancho Cold Storage (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff); As to: H2O To Go/Opal Springs Water, Co., Inc. (Defendant); Fountain of Truth Spring Water, LLC (Defendant); Rancho Cold Storage (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Noha Eid (Plaintiff); As to: H2O To Go/Opal Springs Water, Co., Inc. (Defendant); Fountain of Truth Spring Water, LLC (Defendant); Rancho Cold Storage (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less