This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 22:36:37 (UTC).

NOELLE MUNOZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS NEPTUNE FUNERAL DIVISION; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 NOELLE MUNOZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NEPTUNE FUNERAL DIVISION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5962

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNOZ AN INDIVIDUAL NOELLE

Defendants

ALSWORTH AN INDIVIDUAL SHAWN

MARTIN AN INDIVIDUAL ERIC

NEPTUNE FUNERAL DIVISION; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NEPTUNE MANAGEMENT CORP; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NEPTUNE SOCIETY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NEPTUNE SOCIETY OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NEPTUNE SOCIETY WEST A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SCI DIRECT INC; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SCI SHARED RECOURES LLC AGENT FOR NEPTUNE MANAGEMENT; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAKER DELLA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/13/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

5/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NOELLE MUNOZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NOELLE MUNOZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NOELLE MUNOZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCI Direct, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEPTUNE SOCIETY OF AMERICA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NEPTUNE MANAGEMENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant