This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 10:44:24 (UTC).

NOEL LAUPUA VS CITY OF LONG BEACH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 NOEL LAUPUA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0190

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAUPUA NOEL

Defendants

CITY OF LAKEWOOD

CITY OF LONG BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LALLANDE KARINA NICOLE

LALLANDE MICHAEL LAWRENCE

NGUYEN MINH TRI

THEAM BELINDA

Defendant Attorneys

MOON JENNIFER JULIET

BARBER JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/4/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/12/2022: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

1/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/1/2022: Answer

Answer

2/28/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2024
  • Hearing12/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Lakewood (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Long Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Noel Laupua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Noel Laupua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Noel Laupua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Errata); Filed by Noel Laupua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Noel Laupua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Noel Laupua (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LAKEWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LALLANDE MICHAEL LAWRENCE