Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 02:49:52 (UTC).

NOE INIGUEZ VS MIA SARAH ESPINOZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 NOE INIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIA SARAH ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3901

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INIGUEZ NOE

Defendants

ESPINOZA MIA SARAH

DELAROSA JEREMIE JUANILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/25/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Noe Iniguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Noe Iniguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Noe Iniguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Noe Iniguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Noe Iniguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Noe Iniguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL TIMOTHY PAUL