This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 12:12:13 (UTC).

NOBLE, JANICE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 NOBLE, JANICE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9098

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NOBLE MORRIS

Decedent

NOBLE JANICE

Other

NOBLE MELBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FOX FRANK OLIVER

Other Attorney

LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

9/17/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

9/21/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

11/24/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

Notice - Ruling

11/19/2021: Notice - Ruling

Notice - Hearing

11/19/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

11/18/2021: Minute Order

Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

11/17/2021: Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

Supplement - to Petition for Letters

11/10/2021: Supplement - to Petition for Letters

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

10/29/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Supplement - Supplement

10/20/2021: Supplement - Supplement

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

10/20/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

12/10/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

12/23/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • Hearing03/24/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Hearing03/24/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent); Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Ruling; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketObjection - Appointment of Personal Representative; Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition for Letters ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL