This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 20:49:41 (UTC).

NOAH KROB VS THE HUNTLEY HOTEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2019 NOAH KROB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE HUNTLEY HOTEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES C. LEE, THOMAS D. LONG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6166

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHARLES C. LEE

THOMAS D. LONG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

KROB NOAH

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

THE HUNTLEY HOTEL

HAMELINE WESLEY

ATF PRIVATE SECURITY

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

KROB NOAH

THE HUNTLEY HOTEL

HAMELINE WESLEY

ATF PRIVATE SECURITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIRI ROBERT R.

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SAWYER JAMES FRANCIS

BISSELL JARED DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Request - MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP 877.6)

11/5/2021: Request - MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP 877.6)

Answer

11/23/2021: Answer

Answer

10/14/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

8/30/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

8/30/2021: Answer

Answer

8/30/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1-HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; ...)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1-HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; ...)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

8/3/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/10/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT R. SHIRI IN RESPONSE TO THREE MOTIONS TO COMPEL

7/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT R. SHIRI IN RESPONSE TO THREE MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

7/29/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/4/2020: Answer

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Hearing06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Hearing06/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NOAH KROB (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest (CONSENT REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by WESLEY HAMELINE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE HUNTLEY HOTEL (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by WESLEY HAMELINE (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by WESLEY HAMELINE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by THE HUNTLEY HOTEL (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE HUNTLEY HOTEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by THE HUNTLEY HOTEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by THE HUNTLEY HOTEL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NOAH KROB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NOAH KROB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NOAH KROB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6166 Hearing Date: August 3, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

NOAH KROB,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

THE HUNTLEY HOTEL,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******6166

[TENTATIVE] ORDER FINDING MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED MOOT

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

August 3, 2021

Defendant, the Huntley Hotel (“Defendant”) propounded special interrogatories, form interrogatories, request for admissions (“RFAs”), and request for production of documents (“RPDs”), sets one, on Plaintiff, Noah Krob, on Februry12, 2021. Defendant asserts that as of filing the motions on May 20, 2021, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding interrogatories and RPDs, deeming the RFAs admitted.

On July 27, 2021, Plaintiff filed an opposition to the motions providing Plaintiff served verified responses to each discovery request on June 17, 2021. As of July 29, 2021, no reply has been filed. The court finds that the motions to compel and deem RFAs admitted are moot in light of the responses served on Defendant prior to the hearing. (St. Mary v. Superior Court (2014) 223 Cal.App.4th 762, 776.)

No sanctions are requested, and none are imposed.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 3rd day of August, 2021

Hon. Teresa Sanchez-Gordon

Judge of the Superior Court


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HUNTLEY HOTEL is a litigant

Latest cases where ATF PRIVATE SECURITY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BISSELL JARED D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAWYER JAMES FRANCIS