This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 00:17:36 (UTC).

NK PROPERTIES, LLC, VS EFTHEMIOS TSIBOUKAS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 NK PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EFTHEMIOS TSIBOUKAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7274

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NK PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

TSIBOUKAS EFTHEMIOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAJEWSKI WAYNE S

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Notice of Ruling

3/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: COURTS MINUTE ORDER AND NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: COURTS MINUTE ORDER AND NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

2/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

2/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) OF 02/22/2021

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) OF 02/22/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/22/2021

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 02/22/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AIMEE Y. WONG, ESQ., FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AIMEE Y. WONG, ESQ., FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Notice of Settlement

2/11/2021: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

2/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AIMEE Y WONG ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND A RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT EFTHEMIOS TSIBOUKAS

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AIMEE Y WONG ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND A RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT EFTHEMIOS TSIBOUKAS

Proof of Personal Service

11/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Aimee Y. Wong, Esq., For Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal); Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:42 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:33 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Stipulation to Continue Case Management Confer...) of 02/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (TO DEFENDANT THAT THE PREVIOUSLY NOTICED HEARING DATE OF 12/9/2020 FOR PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 2/9/2021); Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF STEVEN MAVROMIHALIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND A RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT EFTHEMIOS TSIBOUKAS); Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NK PROPERTIES, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NK PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAJEWSKI WAYNE S