This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 09:23:02 (UTC).

NIYATI CHOKSHI VS J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 NIYATI CHOKSHI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against J F SHEA CONSTRUCTION, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3223

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOKSHI NIYATI

Defendants

EYRE KEVIN

J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREITER BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

LEE JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

1/7/2022: Answer

PI General Order

10/8/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2024
  • Hearing09/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by J.F. Shea Construction, Inc (Defendant); Kevin Eyre (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Niyati Chokshi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Niyati Chokshi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Niyati Chokshi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.F. SHEA CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE JAMIE