Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 15:57:47 (UTC).

NIVEA HILL VS AUGUSTO AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 NIVEA HILL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUGUSTO AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5697

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HILL NIVEA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

AGULAR AUGUSTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JOSSEN SANFORD ESQ

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

3/29/2017: PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/17/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less