This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 05:04:33 (UTC).

NITTOLO, JACY VS NITTOLO, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 NITTOLO, JACY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NITTOLO, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0466

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NITTOLO JACY

Respondent

NITTOLO JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAUZON PETER ADAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail (of FL-141 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition (Signed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUZON PETER ADAM