This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 18:50:17 (UTC).

NINO CRISTIANI VS AIMCO VENEZIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/27/2017 NINO CRISTIANI filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against AIMCO VENEZIA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6989

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRISTIANI NINO

CRISTIANI NICOLE

CRISTIANI NICLOE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AIMCO VENEZIA LLC

CASTILLO DAVID ROE 1

CASTILLO DAVID (ROE 1)

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC.

CASTILLO DAVID

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GREIF BELINDA "BILLIE"

ARMORED GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC.

CASTILLO DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN BRUCE M.

CAMPBELL FRANCES MILLER

FARAHANI NIMA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY & GMELICH

CAMPBELL WARREN BERTWELL

ROSSI ANGELA MARIA

LONG & DELIS

SZYMANSKI DAVID EDWARD

SALUTE DARREN PHILLIP

Cross Defendant Attorneys

CODY MICHAEL J

NING LANCE JULIAN

 

Court Documents

Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

7/23/2019: Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

7/24/2019: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AND REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL STATUS OR WEALTH

7/3/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AND REFERENCE TO DEFENDANT'S FINANCIAL STATUS OR WEALTH

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE

7/17/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND SPECIALLY SET HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EXPARTE TO SHORTEN TIME 7-18-19

7/17/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EXPARTE TO SHORTEN TIME 7-18-19

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND SPECIALLY...)

7/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND SPECIALLY...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-06-05 00:00:00

6/5/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-06-05 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE

9/14/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

6/20/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Opposition - To Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint

8/10/2018: Opposition - To Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint

Summons - CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/26/2018: Summons - CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer Second Amended Complaint

11/14/2018: Answer - Answer Second Amended Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Response - Response to Defendant AIMCO VENIZIA, LLC' Supplemental Interrogatories

2/28/2019: Response - Response to Defendant AIMCO VENIZIA, LLC' Supplemental Interrogatories

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLETION DATE

3/22/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLETION DATE

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS

4/5/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • Hearing07/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Hearing07/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Hearing03/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Aimco Venezia, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Armored Group International, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Michael J Cody (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Castillo (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOpposition (and Objection to Motion for Bifurcation); Filed by Aimco Venezia, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
181 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Nino Cristiani (Plaintiff); Nicloe Cristiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE EXEMPLARY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DAVID E. SZYMANSKI ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Aimco Venezia, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nino Cristiani (Plaintiff); Nicloe Cristiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nino Cristiani (Plaintiff); Nicloe Cristiani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT SLIP FOR JURY FEES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC126989    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: N

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiffs Nino Cristiani and Nicole Cristiani’s Motion to Strike Armored Group International Inc.’s Cross-Complaint is DENIED, as MOOT.

Plaintiffs Nino Cristiani and Nicole Cristiani to give notice.

REASONING

Plaintiffs Nino Cristiani and Nicole Cristiani move the Court for an order striking Armored Group International Inc.’s Cross-Complaint against Billie Grief and David Castillo pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 436, subdivision (b), which allows the Court to strike all or any part of any pleading not drawn or filed in conformity with the laws of this state, a court rule, or an order of the court. 

The Court takes care to note that Code of Civil Procedure section 435, subdivision (b)(1), allows any party to move to strike a pleading. Plaintiffs Nino Cristiani and Nicole Cristiani were not a party to Armored Group International, Inc.’s Cross-Complaint filed on January 30, 2018, nor were they named in a subsequent amendment. Therefore, Plaintiffs lack standing to bring a motion to strike the Cross-Complaint. Anticipated complications arising out of the filing of a cross-action do not confer standing to bring a motion to strike. (See Mot., p. 2, lines 12-13.)

Nevertheless, on November 1, 2019, Armored Group International, Inc., filed a request for dismissal of its Cross-Complaint. Thus, the dismissal of Armored Group International, Inc.’s cross-complaint renders the present motion MOOT, and it is accordingly DENIED on that basis.