This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 02:39:32 (UTC).

NINGBO BROTHER APPAREL CO., LTD., A CHINESE CORPORATION VS STAR ACE ASIA, LTD., A HONG KONG CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 NINGBO BROTHER APPAREL CO , LTD , A CHINESE CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against STAR ACE ASIA, LTD , A HONG KONG CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0038

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

NINGBO BROTHER APPAREL CO. LTD. A CHINESE CORPORATION

NINGBO BROTHER APPAREL CO. LTD.

Defendants and Respondents

STAR ACE ASIA LTD. A HONG KONG CORPORATION

STAR ACE ASIA LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MURPHY PAUL D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILI...)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILI...)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

6/29/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Summons - SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION (PLAINTIFF NINGBO BROTHER APPAREL CO. LTD.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR, ALTERN

6/25/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION (PLAINTIFF NINGBO BROTHER APPAREL CO. LTD.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR, ALTERN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Case Management Statement

4/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AMENDED

5/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AMENDED

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/7/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 01/26/2021

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 01/26/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (2nd)); Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( for an Order Permitting Filing of Second Amended Complaint or, alternatively, an Order Shortening the Time for Hearing a Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Permitting Fili...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff Ningbo Brother Apparel Co. LTD.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Permitting Filing of Second Amended Complaint or, alternatively, an Order Shortening the Time for Hearing a Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended); Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (AMENDED); Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 11:50 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 01/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ningbo Brother Apparel Co., Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STAR ACE ASIA LTD. A HONG KONG CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY PAUL D. ESQ.