This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 07:36:57 (UTC).

NINA UGWUMBA VS YOCE KARIN CERVANTES ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 NINA UGWUMBA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOCE KARIN CERVANTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6595

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

UGWUMBA NINA

Defendants and Respondents

RAMIREZ RUBEN HERNANDEZ

CERVANTES MARIA

DOES 1 TO 30 INCLUSIVE

CERVANTES YOCE KARIN

Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GROSSMAN PAUL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CALIN SANDRA ESQ.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KONSTAD ANDREA LOREEN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL);...) OF 06/21/2021

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL);...) OF 06/21/2021

Notice of Ruling

5/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL);...)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (CONDITIONAL);...)

Notice of Lien

1/7/2020: Notice of Lien

Notice of Settlement

2/6/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/06/2020

2/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/06/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

6/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

7/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL

7/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/23/20)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/23/20)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/23/20) OF 10/08/2020

10/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 10/23/20) OF 10/08/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING RESCHEDULED HEARINGS

10/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING RESCHEDULED HEARINGS

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/30/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER (1) GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND (2) SETTING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER (1) GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND (2) SETTING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/28/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/10/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

CoverSheet -

3/1/2018: CoverSheet -

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to appear on 03/09/2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional);...)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional);...) of 06/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional);...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to appear on 03/09/2021) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional);...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Maria Cervantes (Defendant); Yoce Karin Cervantes (Defendant); Ruben Hernandez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((conditional)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Nina Ugwumba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Nina Ugwumba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Maria Cervantes (Defendant); Yoce Karin Cervantes (Defendant); Ruben Hernandez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Maria Cervantes (Defendant); Yoce Karin Cervantes (Defendant); Ruben Hernandez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Maria Cervantes (Defendant); Yoce Karin Cervantes (Defendant); Ruben Hernandez Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION REGARDING CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, YOCE KARIN CERVANTES, MARIA CERVANTES AND RUBEN HERNANDEZ RAMIREZ, TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nina Ugwumba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Nina Ugwumba (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696595    Hearing Date: November 30, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED Dept. 27 1:30 p.m. November 30, 2020

Theodore Kreit seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Nina Ugwumba on grounds that he has been unable to communicate with his client since March 9, 2020. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.)

Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. The Court notes that a notice of settlement has been filed and no prejudice will result from granting this motion. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of this Order on Plaintiff and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

Dated this 30th day of November 2020

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KONSTAD ANDREA LOREEN