This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:17:47 (UTC).

NINA GHAVAMI ET AL VS BP AMERICA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 NINA GHAVAMI filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BP AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3990

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GHAVAMI ZIA

GHAVAMI NINA

Respondents and Defendants

CHEVRON USA INC

BP AMERICA INC

CBS CORPORATION

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

BP P.L.C.

CHANEL INC

CLA-VAL CO

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

UOP LLC

FLUOR MIDEAST LIMITED

GOODRICH CORPORATION WHICH WILL DO

CLA-VAL CO.

THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY

KELLY-MOOR PAINT COMPANY INC.

PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY

CHANEL INC.

ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC

BP AMERICA INC.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOEW KEVIN ESQ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

7/16/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice

12/29/2017: Notice

Notice

10/11/2017: Notice

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (STRICT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE; FALSE REPRESENTATION; INTENTIONAL TORT/INTENTIONAL FAILURE TO WARN/CONCEALMENT; PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE-

6/5/2017: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (STRICT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE; FALSE REPRESENTATION; INTENTIONAL TORT/INTENTIONAL FAILURE TO WARN/CONCEALMENT; PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE-

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/5/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS

6/5/2017: SUMMONS

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/26/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/26/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/26/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/26/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department Legacy; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (STRICT LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE; FALSE REPRESENTATION; INTENTIONAL TORT/INTENTIONAL FAILURE TO WARN/CONCEALMENT; PREMISES OWNER/CONTRACTOR LIABILITY; NEGLIGENCE-JOINT VENTURE/SINGLE BUSINESS ENTERPRISE; ALTER EGO; LO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nina Ghavami (Plaintiff); Zia Ghavami (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLUOR MIDEAST LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where PARSONS INFRASTRUCTURE & TECHNOLOGY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Standard Oil Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UOP LLC is a litigant