This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:51:26 (UTC).

NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY VS IDAHO BROCKTON LP ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IDAHO BROCKTON LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2102

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NIAKOSSARY NILOOFAR

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

IDAHO-BROCKTON LP

ADLER APARTMENTS LLC

NAUMANN JONATHAN

DOES 1 TO 25

ROBERT C WORTH INC.

ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGMENT INC. D3

TRICAL CONSTRUCTION INC. DOE 1

WALSH ROBERT DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

VAZIRI SIAMAK ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CHAVEZ NORMA PEDROZA

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/2/2018: Answer

Answer

4/2/2018: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/2/2018: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

4/2/2018: Cross-Complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/31/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/31/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/31/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/11/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/22/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal

11/13/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/24/2018: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/8/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/2/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/2/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by IDAHO-BROCKTON, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert C Worth, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by JONATHAN NAUMANN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JONATHAN NAUMANN (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NILOOFAR NIAKOSSARY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT C WORTH INC A CALIFORNIA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant