This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 04:30:20 (UTC).

NIKOLAY MACHEVSKY VS CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 NIKOLAY MACHEVSKY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0092

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MACHEVSKY NIKOLAY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION

DOES 1 TO 50

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KAPLAN JERRY ESQ.

KAPLAN JEROME ALAN ESQ.

SKLAR JULIA

SKLAR JULIA ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ZYGELMAN CORINE ESQ.

ZYGELMAN CORINE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...) OF 03/23/2021

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...) OF 03/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...) OF 10/19/2020

10/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANK...) OF 10/19/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF PLAINTIFF;) OF 01/29/2020

1/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY OF PLAINTIFF;) OF 01/29/2020

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR PLAINTIFF

10/25/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR PLAINTIFF

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/27/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Ruling

7/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY

7/9/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND COMPLETE DISCOVERY

7/2/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND COMPLETE DISCOVERY

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN OST RE MTN CONT. TRIAL

6/26/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN OST RE MTN CONT. TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND COMPLETE DISCOVERY

6/27/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE A MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND COMPLETE DISCOVERY

Motion to Continue Trial Date

6/20/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF KELSEY MAXWELL

2/19/2019: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF KELSEY MAXWELL

Declaration - Declaration [In Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel]

11/20/2018: Declaration - Declaration [In Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel]

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/23/2018: CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/23/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

1/23/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • Hearing04/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (of Plaintiff and How Plaintiff Intends to Proceed) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Status Conference Re: Bank...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Status Conference Re: Bank...) of 03/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Julia Sklar, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (of Plaintiff and How Plaintiff Intends to Proceed) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint (of Defendant Crown Towers Homeowners Assiciation); Filed by CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by NIKOLAY MACHEVSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680092    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 2

Machevsky v. Crown Towers Homeowners' Association, et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Nikolay Machevsky, filed on 9/27/19, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZYGELMAN CORINE