This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 12:25:20 (UTC).

NIKOLAUS J. MARCHER, ET AL. VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 NIKOLAUS J MARCHER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2171

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Defendants

3M COMPANY AKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

AES CORPORATION

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

AMETEK INC.

ANHEUSER-BUSCH COMPANIES LLC

ANHEUSER-BUSCH LLC FKA ANHEUSER-BUSCH INCORPORATED

BECHTEL CORPORATION

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.

CALPORTLAND COMPANY FKA CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION

CITY OF RIVERSIDE UTILITIES

CLEAN HARBORS INC.

COPES-VULCAN INC.

CRANE CO.

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

DELEK US ENERGY INC. FKA DELEK US HOLDINGS INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ALON USA ENERGY INC.

E.F. BRADY COMPANY INC.

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL FKA FLUOR CORPORATION

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL INC.

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JAMISON KEVIN D.

BRUNI CHRISTOPHER B.

AMEELE MELANIE LEIGH

MEYERS LESA

PHILLIPS ROBERT DERRICK

PARKER JAMES C.

ASPERICUETA ERIKA R.

BERKES ROBERT HARVEY

CARPENTER ERIN MATTHEW

CHAVES MARISA R.

CROSS E. RENO

DUFFY JOSEPH

GREENSLADE JOSEPH LEO

ILETO ROCHELLE REYES

SCHULTZ DAVID K.

SPANGLER KHARE VIIU

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

RUIZ FERLIN P

SANTANA CARMEN

Other Attorneys

ADAMS BENJAMIN H

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/26/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/20/2022: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION, U.S.A.S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

4/20/2022: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FORMOSA PLASTICS CORPORATION, U.S.A.S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/21/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLCS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/14/2022: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLCS DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS BECHTEL CORPORATION AND SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

4/14/2022: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS BECHTEL CORPORATION AND SEQUOIA VENTURES, INC.

Answer

4/11/2022: Answer

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/8/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Substitution of Attorney

4/8/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATIONS MOTION TO QUASH FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

4/11/2022: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATIONS MOTION TO QUASH FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., AS SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO COPES-VULCAN, INC.S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/11/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., AS SUCCESSOR-IN- INTEREST TO COPES-VULCAN, INC.S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

4/7/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Hearing05/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash for Lack of Jurisdiction for Specially Appearing Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation (Marcher-21STCV42171)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (REDEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; (MARCHER 21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Initial Status Conference ((Marcher-21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on Behalf of Defendants Bechtel Corporation and Sequoia Ventures Inc. (Marcher-21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on Behalf of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Marcher-21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Marcher-21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing - Other (on Demurrer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint on Behalf of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC (Marcher-21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Hearing - Other (REDEFENDANTS BECHTEL CORPORATION?S AND SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; (MARCHER 21STCV42171)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nikolaus J. Marcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nikolaus J. Marcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMetropolitan Life Insurance Company's Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMetropolitan Life Insurance Company's Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMetropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nikolaus J. Marcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nikolaus J. Marcher (Plaintiff); Lynne Marcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nikolaus J. Marcher (Plaintiff); Lynne Marcher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN HARBORS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Delek US Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AES is a litigant

Latest cases where DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant