This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 15:33:03 (UTC).

NIKKI COWART VS DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 NIKKI COWART filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4259

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COWART NIKKI

Defendants

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC.

CASTILLO ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKOVICH GARY

LEVINE MARC ERIC

Defendant Attorney

BREUER ANDREA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

12/14/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/14/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PI General Order

12/14/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

12/14/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

2/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Request for Dismissal

2/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

12/29/2020: Association of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Hearing05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Nikki Cowart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Nikki Cowart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Nikki Cowart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Nikki Cowart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Nikki Cowart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Nikki Cowart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE MARC ERIC