This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 04:39:18 (UTC).

NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY, ET AL. VS AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 NIKI ALEXANDER SHETTY filed an Other lawsuit against AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8255

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZARAESCU ADINA

SHETTY NIKI ALEXANDER

ZAHARESCU ADINA

SHETTY NIKI- ALEXANDER

Defendants

AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE SERVICING INC.

AMERIQUEST SPECIAL SERVICING

OCWEN FINANCIAL SERVICES

OCWEN LOAN SERVICES

LITTON LOAN SERVICING

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST CO. AS TRUSTEE FOR ASSET-BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2004-FR1

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST CO.

PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES

CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC.

AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY

AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE SERVICING INC

OCWEN LOAN SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTOGNINI RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorneys

AMAN KALLEY RAE

COOPER NEIL

ATWAL JASDEEP SINGH

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF POOYA E. SOHI RE GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF POOYA E. SOHI RE GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PRIOR TO FILING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASDEEP ATWAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITI RESIDENTIAL LEASING, INC.S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASDEEP ATWAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITI RESIDENTIAL LEASING, INC.S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/10/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/24/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEIL J. COOPER RE ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER

2/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEIL J. COOPER RE ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • Hearing07/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Hearing07/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Hearing05/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Ameriquest Mortgage Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Pooya E. Sohi in Support of Defendant Mortgage Company's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint); Filed by Ameriquest Mortgage Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Ameriquest Mortgage Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Litton Loan Servicing (Defendant); Ocwen Financial Services (Defendant); Ocwen Loan Services, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Litton Loan Servicing (Defendant); Ocwen Financial Services (Defendant); Ocwen Loan Services, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Niki- Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Niki- Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff); Adina Zaraescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff); Adina Zaraescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff); Adina Zaraescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff); Adina Zaraescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Niki Alexander Shetty (Plaintiff); Adina Zaraescu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITI RESIDENTIAL LENDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LITTON LOAN SERVICING LP is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PHH Mortgage Corporation is a litigant